CT SB00311 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To update food product enrichment requirements.
Title
An Act Concerning Food Enrichment Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 104 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 108 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 104 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 108 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-172 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 402 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-07 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-23 | Senate | File Number 171 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 160 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |