CT SB00307 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - File Number 519
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - File Number 519
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) increase prosecutorial accountability by (A) providing that the Criminal Justice Commission be an autonomous body, (B) requiring biennial performance evaluations of state's attorneys, (C) requiring adoption and implementation of uniform policies, (D) amending training requirements for prosecutors, (E) outlining data upon which state's attorney performance ratings are based, (F) making policies and reports available online, and (G) adding use of force investigations as a category for which case level data is collected, and (2) repeal the requirement that in the investigation and prosecution of crime, priority be given to crimes involving physical violence or the possession of a firearm.
Title
An Act Concerning Prosecutorial Accountability.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Anne Hughes [D] |
Rep. Edwin Vargas [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. Joshua Hall [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | File Number 519 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 382 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |