CT SB00306 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - House Calendar Number 547
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - House Calendar Number 547
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make inadmissible statements or admissions obtained through the use of deceptive interrogation tactics.
Title
An Act Concerning Deceptive Interrogation Tactics.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Anne Hughes [D] |
Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 282 (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 283 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 283 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | House Calendar Number 547 |
2022-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-05-02 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 5986 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6273 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5818 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | File Number 518 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 381 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |