CT SB00301 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to (1) identify landlords who were not reimbursed for rental payments under the UniteCT program, and (2) reimburse landlords who were denied solely for lack of tenant participation.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program To Fund Reimbursements To Landlords For Lost Rental Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-30 | Senate | File Number 221 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 177 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |