CT SB00301 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Public Hearing 03/24
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Public Hearing 03/24
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To allow for bipartisan review of emergency declarations.
Title
An Act Concerning Bipartisan Review Of Emergency Declarations.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Gale Mastrofrancesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |