CT SB00299 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-04 - House Calendar Number 484
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-04 - House Calendar Number 484
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to evaluate the impact of large data centers on grid reliability.
Title
An Act Concerning Data Centers.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. Aundre Bumgardner [D] | Rep. Holly Cheeseman [R] | Rep. Devin Carney [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 190 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-04 | House | House Calendar Number 484 |
2024-05-04 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-05-03 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5469 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | File Number 344 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 231 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |