CT SB00295 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical revisions to certain public health statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations Regarding Technical Revisions To The Public Health Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 100 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 102 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 100 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 102 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 18-48 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 461 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 331 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 202 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |