CT SB00294 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 264
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 264
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit a landlord from taking certain adverse actions against a tenant based on such tenant's family violence victim status.
Title
An Act Concerning Housing Protections For Victims Of Family Violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 264 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 218 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |