CT SB00294 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Public Hearing 03/19
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Public Hearing 03/19
Pending: Joint Government Administration and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require that the State Elections Enforcement Commission return to a campaign treasurer any contribution that does not qualify toward receiving a grant under the Citizens' Election Program so that such treasurer may return such contribution to the contributor.
Title
An Act Concerning Qualifying Contributions Under The Citizens' Election Program.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Paul Formica [R] | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Rep. Gale Mastrofrancesco [R] |
Sen. Robert Sampson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |