CT SB00294 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Developmental Services to take certain actions relating to the Department of Developmental Services' waiting list, to require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to consult with stakeholders on a plan to close facilities operated by the department and to require advance notice when an individual with intellectual disability's eligibility for state-assisted care will end.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Services For Individuals With Intellectual Disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 264 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 268 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-26SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-05-16SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2016-05-16SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2016-05-11SenatePublic Act 16-60
2016-05-02SenateIn Concurrence
2016-05-02SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-05-02SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-05-01SenateHouse Calendar Number 558
2016-05-01SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-04-30SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2016-04-30SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-30SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5698
2016-04-19SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-19SenateNo New File by Committee on Human Services
2016-04-19SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-19SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-19SenateJoint Favorable
2016-04-13SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
2016-04-06SenateFile Number 509
2016-04-06SenateSenate Calendar Number 334
2016-04-06SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-06SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-31SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM
2016-03-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-21SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-02-26SenatePublic Hearing 03/02
2016-02-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback