CT SB00293 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Senate Recommitted to Public Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the recommendations of the School Nurse Advisory Council by changing the council's membership requirements, requiring school nurses to complete an orientation program and requiring school districts to complete the annual health services program information survey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Recommendations And Membership Of The School Nurse Advisory Council.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26SenateSenate Recommitted to Public Health
2016-04-20SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-20SenateNo New File by Committee on Education
2016-04-20SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-20SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-20SenateJoint Favorable
2016-04-13SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Education
2016-04-04SenateFile Number 434
2016-04-04SenateSenate Calendar Number 307
2016-04-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-04SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-28SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM
2016-03-17SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-16SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-02-26SenatePublic Hearing 03/02
2016-02-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback