CT SB00293 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To ensure permanency plan documents and hearings include information regarding what steps the department has taken to make any necessary referrals for children under five years of age to early intervention, preschool, or special education services, steps taken to enable a child sixteen years of age or older to learn independent living skills and complete a secondary education or vocation program, and steps taken to develop a personalized transition plan for children between the ages of sixteen and eighteen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Permanency And Transition Plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 223 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 153 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-31 Signed by the Governor
2012-05-18 Transmitted to the Secretary of State
2012-05-11 Public Act 12-53
2012-05-04 In Concurrence
2012-05-04 House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule
2012-05-04 House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2012-04-20 House Calendar Number 420
2012-04-20 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-04-18 On Consent Calendar
2012-04-18 Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2012-04-18 Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3281
2012-04-11 File Number 366
2012-04-11 Senate Calendar Number 273
2012-04-11 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-11 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-04 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM
2012-03-26 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-22 Joint Favorable
2012-03-16 Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
2012-03-16 Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
2012-03-16 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-09 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-08 Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services
2012-03-01 Public Hearing 03/06
2012-02-29 Referred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback