CT SB00292 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 245
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 245
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) prohibit the use of electric resistance or fossil fuel combustion systems in new residential construction or major alterations of residential buildings; and (2) establish a program for training and education of construction professionals in certain alternative residential heating sources.
Title
An Act Concerning Heating Efficiency In New Construction And Major Alterations Of Residential Buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet-A (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 245 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 196 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |