CT SB00288 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require local and regional boards of education to maintain healthy indoor air quality in their schools.
Title
An Act Concerning Indoor Air Quality In Schools.
Sponsors
House Public Health Committee | Rep. Robyn Porter [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Tom Arnone [D] |
Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Rep. Caroline Simmons [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2021-04-15 | Senate | File Number 483 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 297 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/08 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |