CT SB00284 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Public Hearing 03/13
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Public Hearing 03/13
Pending: Joint Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the importation of big five African species.
Title
An Act Concerning Cecil's Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |