CT SB00283 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To eliminate income and asset limits for working persons with disabilities to qualify for Medicaid.
Title
An Act Eliminating Income And Asset Limits For The Med-connect Program For Persons With Disabilities And Increasing Income And Asset Limits For Husky C.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] |
Rep. Susan Johnson [D] | Rep. Larry Butler [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | File Number 366 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 265 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |