CT SB00279 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To recommend minor and technical changes to the higher education and employment advancement statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Legislative Commissioners' Office Regarding Minor And Technical Changes To The Higher Education And Employment Advancement Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 256 (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 109 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 109 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 22-126 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 366 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | File Number 219 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 175 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |