CT SB00274 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Motion Failed (JF)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to establish the Learn Here, Live Here program to help graduates of any institution of higher education or certain certificate programs of private occupational schools save toward a down payment on their first home in the state by segregating a portion of their state income tax payments for up to ten years after they graduate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Requiring The Establishment Of The Learn Here, Live Here Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (MOTION FAILED) (Y: 16 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateMotion Failed (JF)
2019-05-09SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-09SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7191
2019-04-02SenateFile Number 310
2019-04-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 155
2019-04-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/28
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
2019-02-13SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-24SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-23SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback