CT SB00265 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To extend from two years to four years the time covered by certifications for moderators and alternate moderators.
Title
An Act Concerning Certification Of Moderators And Alternate Moderators.
Sponsors
House Government Administration and Elections Committee | Sen. Mae Flexer [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Henry Genga [D] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 55 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 55 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 19-67 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-05 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | House Calendar Number 458 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | File Number 510 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 232 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |