CT SB00264 | 2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To (1) amend provisions concerning the bonding authority and liability of the Connecticut Municipal Redevelopment Authority, (2) require state actors to notify the Treasurer of reportable financial obligations and agreements, (3) require the prior approval of the Treasurer for certain transactions, and (4) delete provisions concerning the Tax-Exempt Proceeds Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Bonding Authority Of The Connecticut Municipal Redevelopment Authority, The Reporting Of Material Financial Obligations By State Agencies, Tax-exempt Proceeds Fund References And The Notification Of The Sale Or Lease Of Projects Financed With Bond Proceeds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 271 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor
2024-05-22SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2024-05-22SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2024-05-17SenatePublic Act 24-62
2024-05-08SenateIn Concurrence
2024-05-08HouseHouse Passed
2024-05-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 435
2024-05-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2024-04-30SenateSenate Passed
2024-04-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2024-04-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2024-04-22SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-04-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-04-22SenateJoint Favorable
2024-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2024-04-10SenateFile Number 386
2024-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 248
2024-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2024-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/24 5:00 PM
2024-03-25SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2024-03-22SenateJoint Favorable
2024-02-29SenatePublic Hearing 03/04
2024-02-28SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00264&which_year=2024
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TOB/S/PDF/2024SB-00264-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TOB/S/PDF/2024SB-00264-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TOB/S/PDF/2024SB-00264-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/ACT/PA/PDF/2024PA-00062-R00SB-00264-PA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/FN/PDF/2024SB-00264-R000386-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/BA/PDF/2024SB-00264-R000386-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/SUM/PDF/2024SUM00062-R01SB-00264-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TS/S/PDF/2024SB-00264-R00GAE-CV106-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/TS/S/PDF/2024SB-00264-R00FIN-CV69-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/VOTE/S/PDF/2024SV-00142-R00SB00264-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2024/VOTE/H/PDF/2024HV-00271-R00SB00264-HV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback