CT SB00257 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require certain health care providers to offer hepatitis C screening tests to certain patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Hepatitis C Testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 160 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-05-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2014-05-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2014-05-22SenatePublic Act 14-203
2014-05-07SenateIn Concurrence
2014-05-07SenateOn Consent Calendar
2014-05-07SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2014-05-07SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-25SenateHouse Calendar Number 456
2014-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2014-04-23SenateOn Consent Calendar
2014-04-23SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2014-04-23SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3773
2014-04-08SenateFile Number 422
2014-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 287
2014-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
2014-03-24SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-21SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2014-03-10SenatePublic Hearing 03/14
2014-02-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback