CT SB00251 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To develop initiatives that address the critical shortage of nursing and health care professionals in the state.
Title
An Act Expanding Training Programs For Careers In Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 177 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Special Act 22-9 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 505 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5616 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 242 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 193 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |