CT SB00250 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a loan reimbursement program for Connecticut residents who graduated from a state university.
Title
An Act Concerning Student Loan Reimbursement For Connecticut Residents Who Graduated From A State University.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 263 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 217 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |