CT SB00249 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 607
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - File Number 607
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To afford greater legal protections to persons who are adversely affected by criteria implemented by the Department of Social Services in administering the home-care program for the elderly.
Title
An Act Concerning Administration Of The Home-care Program For The Elderly By The Department Of Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 607 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 358 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |