CT SB00242 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - House Calendar Number 425
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - House Calendar Number 425
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group to develop strategies for the restoration of eel grass along the state's shoreline.
Title
An Act Establishing A Working Group On The Restoration Of Eel Grass.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Sen. Gary Winfield [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Brandon Chafee [D] |
Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Sen. Paul Formica [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 425 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 441 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 307 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |