CT SB00241 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Calendar Number 499
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Calendar Number 499
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the penalties for intentionally injuring or killing any police animal or dog that is a member of a volunteer canine search and rescue team.
Title
An Act Concerning The Penalty For The Intentional Injury Or Killing Of Police Animals Or Dogs In Volunteer Canine Search And Rescue Teams.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 499 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3725 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | File Number 547 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 332 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |