CT SB00241 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify certain hunting and fishing license fees for persons sixteen and seventeen years of age, reduce certain fishing fees and establish a registration requirement for persons who conduct hunting or fishing guide services.
Title
An Act Concerning Youth Hunting And Fishing Licenses, Revising Certain Hunting And Fishing License Fees And Requiring Registration By Hunting And Fishing Guide Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 79 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 79 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 14-201 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-10 | Senate | House Calendar Number 325 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3454 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | File Number 66 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 71 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |