CT SB00237 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 438
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 438
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To provide funding for fish hatcheries.
Title
An Act Concerning The Funding Of Fish Hatcheries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 438 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 304 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |