CT SB00237 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - File Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - File Number 564
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To protect Rocky Top and York Hill in Hamden as traprock ridges for purposes of preservation.
Title
An Act Designating York Hill As A Protected Traprock Ridge.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] |
Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | File Number 564 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 276 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |