CT SB00236 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 241
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - File Number 241
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish emission, use and exhaust standards for certain diesel reciprocating engines used for peak shaving.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Back-up Diesel Generators For Purposes Of Peak Shaving.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] |
Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Rep. John Hampton [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 241 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 192 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |