CT SB00236 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the time period to award a school security grant from June 30, 2016, to June 30, 2017.
Title
An Act Extending The School Security Infrastructure Competitive Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 149 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 149 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-171 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 468 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-03-24 | Senate | File Number 212 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 183 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |