CT SB00235 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require veterinarians to report to local law enforcement agencies when they treat dogs that they believe have been used in animal fighting.
Title
An Act Concerning Veterinary Reporting Of Dogs Used In Animal Fighting.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Craig Fishbein [R] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Nicole Klarides-Ditria [R] |
Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Rep. Kimberly Fiorello [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 437 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 303 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |