CT SB00233 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To retain the regulation of maple syrup and honey production with the Department of Agriculture.
Title
An Act Concerning Cottage Food Products And The Production Of Honey And Maple Syrup.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Roll Call Vote 245 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 84 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Public Act 19-18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 511 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A 7546 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7546 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | File Number 47 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 48 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |