CT SB00233 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase to twenty-five dollars the value of voucher books each eligible senior citizen can receive toward purchases at farmers' markets.
Title
An Act Increasing The Dollar Value Of Farmers' Market Voucher Books For Senior Citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | Senate | File Number 102 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 86 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |