CT SB00229 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - File Number 137
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - File Number 137
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a school mapping data grant program.
Title
An Act Establishing A School Mapping Data Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | File Number 137 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 113 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/29 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |