CT SB00229 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - File Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a charter school approval grant account for the purpose of funding new charter schools.
Title
An Act Concerning The Process By Which A Charter Is Granted And Funding Is Provided For A New Charter School.
Sponsors
House Education Committee | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] |
Rep. Robert Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | File Number 647 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 460 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |