CT SB00225 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 142
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-28 - File Number 142
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit common interest ownership communities from banning certain rooftop solar installations.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Rooftop Solar Installations In Common Interest Ownership Communities.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Rep. Lucy Dathan [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | File Number 142 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 129 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |