CT SB00224 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical revisions to statutes concerning planning and development.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Minor And Technical Revisions To Statutes Concerning Planning And Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 152 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 123 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 123 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-23 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 375 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | File Number 141 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 128 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |