CT SB00223 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To exempt active duty service members who were not residents of Connecticut at the time of induction from fees for motor vehicle operator's licenses or registrations.
Title
An Act Exempting All Active Duty Service Members From Fees For Motor Vehicle Operator's Licenses Or Registrations.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Ronald Napoli [D] |
Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |