CT SB00222 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To remove obsolete, unnecessary and duplicative reports and programs contained in the general statutes that affect the Labor Department.
Title
An Act Concerning The Repeal Of Obsolete Reports And Programs Involving The Labor Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 132 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 132 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Public Act 16-170 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 440 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Commerce |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce |
2016-03-24 | Senate | File Number 209 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 179 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |