CT SB00218 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To include initial active duty for training purposes to be counted as qualifying service for veterans' benefits eligibility for operators' licenses, veteran designation on license plates and college credit for military training.
Title
An Act Concerning Eligibility For Certain Veterans' Benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |