CT SB00217 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) create a Hate Crimes Investigative Unit within the State Police and establish its duties; (2) require development of a reporting system, best practices and a model investigation policy for law enforcement units regarding hate crimes; (3) establish time requirements for law enforcement units to report hate crimes to the Hate Crimes Investigative Unit; and (4) designate the head of the unit as a member of the State-Wide Hate Crimes Advisory Council.
Title
An Act Establishing A Hate Crimes Investigative Unit Within The Division Of State Police And Requiring Development Of A Reporting System, Best Practices And A Model Investigation Policy For Law Enforcement Units Regarding Hate Crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 132 (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 112 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 112 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-9 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 374 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | File Number 94 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 100 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |