CT SB00217 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Health Information Technology Officer to establish a working group concerning polypharmacy and medication reconciliation.
Title
An Act Requiring The Health Information Technology Officer To Establish A Working Group To Evaluate Issues Concerning Polypharmacy And Medication Reconciliation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Special Act 18-6 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 525 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-11 | Senate | File Number 419 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 244 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |