CT SB00217 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide that any student whose parent or legal guardian has been called to duty in, is on leave from, or has returned from deployment to a combat zone or combat supporting post shall be granted at least ten days of excused absence, and to ensure that such student does not fall behind other students by requiring that he or she complete assignments missed during the period of excused absence.
Title
An Act Concerning Excused Absences From School For Children Of Service Members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 127 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Public Act 14-198 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 421 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3616 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | File Number 480 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 303 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |