CT SB00210 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make technical and other changes to the Labor Department statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Technical And Other Changes To The Labor Department Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 204 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 163 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 163 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Public Act 22-67 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 444 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | File Number 82 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 87 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |