CT SB00209 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 502
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - File Number 502
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) require certain nonresident landlords, project-based housing providers or agents in charge of rental properties to register certain personal identifying information, and (2) to increase penalties for repeat violations of building and fire codes.
Title
An Act Concerning Nonresident Landlord Registration And Increasing Penalties For Repeat Building And Fire Code Violations.
Sponsors
House Housing Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Maryam Khan [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Rep. Antonio Felipe [D] | Sen. Jan Hochadel [D] | Sen. Herron Gaston [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - HSG Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | File Number 502 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 290 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |