CT SB00208 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-24 - Public Hearing 02/28
Pending: Joint Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To expand daily access to low-cost or free transportation throughout the state for persons with disabilities to improve their quality of life and facilitate their ability to work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Expanding Access To Low-cost Or Free Transportation For Persons With Disabilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-24SenatePublic Hearing 02/28
2023-02-17SenatePublic Hearing 02/21
2023-02-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services
2023-02-15SenateDrafted by Committee
2023-01-19SenateVote to Draft
2023-01-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Human Services

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback