CT SB00204 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide that governmental immunity is not a defense in a civil action for damages to person or property caused by the negligent operation of a motor vehicle owned by a political subdivision of the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Damages To Person Or Property Caused By The Negligent Operation Of A Motor Vehicle Owned By A Political Subdivision Of The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 171 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 148 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-22 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 443 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | File Number 483 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 325 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |