CT SB00204 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the requirement that the several companies of the Governor's Guard be filled by voluntary enlistments.
Title
An Act Eliminating Simultaneous Membership In Multiple Units Of The State Military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 16-165 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2016-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 463 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | File Number 96 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 131 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |