CT SB00191 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To revise provisions regarding payments to federally qualified health centers and set limitations on nonemergency dental visits at such centers.
Title
An Act Concerning Federally Qualified Health Center Payments And The Provision Of Nonemergency Dental Services At Such Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-29 | Senate | File Number 158 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 147 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |